Menu
Home Page

Hot

You may want to use a combination of mental and written methods as well as jottings to help you answer these questions! 

 

Two digit by one digit Two digit by two digit Three digit by two digit
12x4= 22x15= 324x25=
18x5= 27x18= 228x16=
22x6= 32x21= 357x89=
24x9= 44x18= 496x23=
32x8= 52x23= 521x87=
44x7= 66x32= 653x78
59x3= 86x45= 752x32=
91x9= 98x12= 985x45=
99x8= 96x28= 7456x218=

 

 

Top